This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/22/2017 at 18:38:46 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Mercedes Ministero

Case Summary

On 02/09/2016 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mercedes Ministero. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2568

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

MINISTERO, MERCEDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIGELMAN, JACOB M

275 West Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketOrder-Granting Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketPending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Tue Apr 11 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Jan 10 09:00:00 CST 2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion Date: Tue Jan 10 09:00:00 CST 2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Aug 09 09:00:00 CDT 2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Jun 28 09:00:00 CDT 2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob M. Figelman