Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/09/2021 at 03:18:53 (UTC).

Student Loan Solutions, LLC vs. Edgar Jaime, Imelda Jaime

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Student Loan Solutions, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Edgar Jaime, Imelda Jaime. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8578

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Student Loan Solutions, LLC

Defendants

Jaime, Edgar

Houston, TX 77015

Jaime, Imelda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gunthorpe, Kevin D

P.O. 3267

Bellaire, TX 77402

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David A

2190 North Loop West Suite 333

Houston, TX 77018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOrder-Pretrial Discovery 500.9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMotion for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Student Loan Solutions, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC is a litigant