This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/09/2023 at 03:18:57 (UTC).

Stonehaven vs. Zachary Smith, A 'Breanne Torres-Ramirez

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Stonehaven filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Zachary Smith, A 'Breanne Torres-Ramirez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1842

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stonehaven

Defendants

Smith, Zachary

Houston, TX 77040

Torres-Ramirez, A'Breanne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fulton, Kevin

7676 Hillmont Street, Suite191

Houston, TX 77040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Stonehaven

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Stonehaven; Parties Against: Smith, Zachary and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $7007.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $183.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Stonehaven

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STONEHAVEN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fulton, Kevin