This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 11:52:14 (UTC).

Steve Nash vs. Debbie Moreau

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 Steve Nash filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Debbie Moreau. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3997

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nash, Steve

Houston, TX 77015

Defendant

Moreau, Debbie

Porter, TX 77365

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wexler, Charles W, Jr

2203 Timberloch Place Suite 100

The Woodlands, TX 77380

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • Proposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Order-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages Counter Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Counter Claim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Moreau, Debbie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Nash, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Wed Jan 03 08:30:00 CST 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Disposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less