This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/02/2018 at 01:52:07 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Tonyette Monique Rogers Aka Tonyette Rogers

Case Summary

On 10/04/2011 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Tonyette Monique Rogers Aka Tonyette Rogers. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5785

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Tonyette Monique Rogers Aka Tonyette Rogers

Houston, TX 77078

Smith, Robin V

Rogers, Tonyette M

Houston, TX 77078

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Banker, Jan G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2014
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Smith, Robin V and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less