Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/16/2018 at 13:20:55 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Terric R Ayers Aka Terric Ayers

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Terric R Ayers Aka Terric Ayers. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1023

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

TERRIC R AYERS AKA TERRIC AYERS

Fresno, TX 77545

KUBOSH, PAUL

Houston, TX 77007

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Terric R Ayers Aka Terric Ayers and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less