This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/15/2021 at 05:34:24 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Samee M Ahmed

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Samee M Ahmed. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2225

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Citizen, William J, Jr.

Ahmed, Samee Mahir

Houston, TX 77041-0000

Ahmed, Samee M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketBond Forfeiture-Notice to Defendant Surety Bond 501.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketBond Forfeiture-Judgment NISI Filed

    Read MoreRead Less