This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/18/2018 at 16:32:23 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Melissa Anne Mactavish Aka Melissa Mactavish Aka M Mactavish

Case Summary

On 04/13/2011 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Melissa Anne Mactavish Aka Melissa Mactavish Aka M Mactavish. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9896

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Sprecher, David S

Melissa Anne Mactavish Aka Melissa Mactavish Aka M Mactavish

Houston, TX 77036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Rosenberg, Robert Victor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Melissa Anne Mactavish Aka Melissa Mactavish Aka M Mactavish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less