This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/29/2018 at 00:44:34 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Maria Elena Salazar Aka Maria E Salazar

Case Summary

On 06/04/2013 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Maria Elena Salazar Aka Maria E Salazar. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9271

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

MARIA ELENA SALAZAR AKA MARIA E SALAZAR

Houston, TX 77049

CANTU, RODOLFO F

Houston, TX 77023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Gallego, Robert Daniel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Cantu, Rodolfo F and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less