This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/17/2018 at 06:15:01 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Marco Antonio Minez Aka Marco Minez

Case Summary

On 07/05/2011 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Marco Antonio Minez Aka Marco Minez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5188

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Montes, Lucio Antonio

Marco Antonio Minez Aka Marco Minez

Houston, TX 77060

Minez, Marco A

Houston, TX 77060

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2013
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Montes, Lucio Antonio and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less