This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/29/2018 at 00:51:23 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Malcolm Derrail Williams Aka Malcolm D Williams Aka Malcolm Williams

Case Summary

On 04/11/2012 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Malcolm Derrail Williams Aka Malcolm D Williams Aka Malcolm Williams. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0521

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Malcolm Derrail Williams Aka Malcolm D Williams Aka Malcolm Williams

Malcolm Derrail Williams Aka Malcolm Williams

Houston, TX 77026

Smith, Robin V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Banker, Jan G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2014
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Malcolm Derrail Williams Aka Malcolm Williams and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less