This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/15/2018 at 07:24:53 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Kristin Renea Thornton

Case Summary

On 08/03/2012 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Kristin Renea Thornton. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4860

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

THORNTON, KRISTIN RENEA

BALLARD, JOHNNY

Thornton, Kristin R

Humble, TX 77346

Other

Banker, Jan G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2014
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Thornton, Kristin R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less