This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/23/2018 at 01:38:28 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Hendrix Aka Volker Jennifer Ashley Aka Jennifer Ashley Hendrix

Case Summary

On 07/12/2012 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Hendrix Aka Volker Jennifer Ashley Aka Jennifer Ashley Hendrix. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4339

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

HENDRIX AKA VOLKER JENNIFER ASHLEY AKA JENNIFER ASHLEY HENDRIX

16718 Main St. #3

Splendora, TX 77372

KIDWELL, DENNIS

Volker, Teresa

Other

Banker, Jan G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2014
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Kidwell, Dennis and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less