This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/06/2018 at 00:09:07 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Hector A Espinosa Aka Hector Espinoza

Case Summary

On 05/23/2011 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Hector A Espinosa Aka Hector Espinoza. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5035

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Hector A Espinosa Aka Hector Espinoza

Houston, TX 77026

Solis, Manuel E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2013
  • Bond Forfeiture-Release of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Solis, Manuel E and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less