This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/15/2018 at 07:47:01 (UTC).

State of Texas vs. Carlos Alberto Figueroa Aka Carlos Figueroa Aka Carlos A Figueroa

Case Summary

On 05/17/2011 State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Carlos Alberto Figueroa Aka Carlos Figueroa Aka Carlos A Figueroa. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1397

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Prince, Lennon S

Carlos Alberto Figueroa Aka Carlos Figueroa Aka Carlos A Figueroa

Houston, TX 77083

Figueroa, Carlos A

Houston, TX 77083

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2012
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Figueroa, Carlos A and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less