This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/01/2019 at 14:37:35 (UTC).

Sprint Waste Services LP vs. Box Tight Services Llc

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 Sprint Waste Services LP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Box Tight Services Llc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1036

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sprint Wast Services LP

Po Box 940820

Houston, TX 77094

Sprint Waste Services LP

Po Box 940820

Houston, TX 77094

Defendant

Box Tight Services Llc

23193 Nichols Sawmill Rd

Hockley, TX 77447

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Docket Control Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Docket Control Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Sprint Waste Services LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Sprint Waste Services LP; Parties Against: Box Tight Services Llc; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $5441.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less