Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/18/2021 at 18:26:00 (UTC).

Solar Supply Inc vs. Ruben Zambrano

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Solar Supply Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ruben Zambrano. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1623

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Solar Supply Inc

1308 Waverly St

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant

Zambrano, Ruben

Houston, TX 77018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Simmons, Richard A

15150 Middlebrook Drive

Houston, TX 77058

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $125.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Solar Supply Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Certified Copy Requested Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solar Supply Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simmons, Richard A