Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/01/2017 at 16:28:50 (UTC).

Solar Supply Inc vs. George Tipton

Case Summary

On 11/28/2016 Solar Supply Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against George Tipton. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4181

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLAR SUPPLY INC

1308 Waverly

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant

TIPTON, GEORGE

Houston, TX 77018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Pending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solar Supply Inc is a litigant