This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 14:31:57 (UTC).

Skyhouse Houston II LLC vs. CDG LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Skyhouse Houston II LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CDG LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5428

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skyhouse Houston II LLC

Defendant

CDG LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/17/2017

DocketWrit of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2017

DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2017

DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2017

DocketDefault Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2017

DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2017

DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2017

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2017

DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2017

DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2017

DocketEviction Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2017

DocketPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Skyhouse Houston II LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2017

DocketPayment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Skyhouse Houston II LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2017

DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less