Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/22/2018 at 13:14:52 (UTC).

Shell Federal Credit Union vs. Hector J Ramirez

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Shell Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hector J Ramirez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7112

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Po Box 578

Deer Park, TX 77536

Defendant

RAMIREZ, HECTOR J

Houston, TX 77034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON E

P O Box 809

Baytown, TX 77522

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2016
  • Writ of Execution-Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Payment Information: Amount: $155.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Shell Federal Credit Union

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Shell Federal Credit Union; Parties Against: Ramirez, Hector J; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $8244.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less