This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/31/2023 at 04:18:08 (UTC).

SFR Investments V Borrower 1, LLC vs. Penelope Keys, Tamera Keys

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 SFR Investments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Borrower 1, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1037

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR Investments V Borrower 1, LLC

Defendants

Keys, Penelope

Humble, TX 77346

Keys, Tamera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ferguson, Christopher S

P.O. Box 815369

Dallas, TX 75381

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Dec 13 09:00:00 CST 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Nov 29 09:00:00 CST 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $183.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: SFR Investments V Borrower 1, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S Ferguson