This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:12:41 (UTC).

Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (Wayfair) vs. Rick Barrett

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank Wayfair filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rick Barrett. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8431

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (Wayfair)

Defendant

Barrett, Rick

Cypress, TX 77429

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooks, Jasmine Necole

15660 N Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketPending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (Wayfair)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less