Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 14:26:27 (UTC).

SCIL TEXAS, LLC d/b/a SPEEDY CASH vs. Monique Turner

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 SCIL TEXAS, LLC d/b/a SPEEDY CASH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Monique Turner. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0171

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCIL TEXAS, LLC d/b/a SPEEDY CASH

Defendant

Turner, Monique

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

West, James A

957 Nasa Parkway #503

Houston, TX 77058

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Notice-Default Judgment 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Order-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Request for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Debt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: SCIL TEXAS, LLC d/b/a SPEEDY CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Judgment: Parties For: SCIL TEXAS, LLC d/b/a SPEEDY CASH; Parties Against: Turner, Monique; Post-Judgment Interest: 10.0000%; Judgment Amount: $942.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCIL TEXAS, LLC d/b/a SPEEDY CASH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer West, James A