This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/23/2018 at 13:57:31 (UTC).

Scil Texas Inc D/B/A Speedy Cash vs. Michelle L. Moak

Case Summary

On 05/18/2016 Scil Texas Inc D/B/A Speedy Cash filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michelle L Moak. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0449

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCIL TEXAS INC D/B/A SPEEDY CASH

Defendant

MOAK, MICHELLE L.

Receivers

Kovach, James F.

Hillman, Nicole Celeste

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEST, JAMES A

957 Nasa Pkwy #503

Houston, TX 77058

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketOrder Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketBond Posted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketReceivers Bond Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketCertified Copy Requested Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $100.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Registry Deposit; Receipt Description: Registry Deposit; Payor Name: Scil Texas Inc D/B/A Speedy Cash

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $3.25; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: West, James A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketHearing: Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCIL TEXAS, LLC d/b/a SPEEDY CASH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer West, James A