This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/10/2021 at 02:45:37 (UTC).

RUBICON vs. Mildred Johnson

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 RUBICON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mildred Johnson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6808

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUBICON

7302 Corporate Drive

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant

Johnson, Mildred

Houston, TX 77036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBICON

7302 Corporate Drive

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant Attorney

Johnson, Mildred

7310 Corporate Drive Apt 211

Houston, TX 77036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: RUBICON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: RUBICON; Parties Against: Johnson, Mildred; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $4185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: RUBICON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rubicon LLC is a litigant