This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/16/2023 at 14:02:14 (UTC).

ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY vs. Jason Gilbert

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jason Gilbert. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4661

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY

Defendant

Gilbert, Jason

Cypress, TX 77429

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Noack, Carolyn J

24165 Ih-10 West, Ste 217-418

San Antonio, TX 78257

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less