This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/23/2021 at 04:07:14 (UTC).

Roger Fountain vs. OPORTUN, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Roger Fountain filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OPORTUN, INC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1847

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fountain, Roger

8546 Hwy 6 N #419

Houston, TX 77095

Defendant

OPORTUN, INC.

2 Circle Star Way

San Carlos, CA 94070

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $64.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Fountain, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketConsent for Email Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fountain, Roger is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant