This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 22:19:23 (UTC).

Rodney Jones vs. Dr. Uzoma Nriagu

Case Summary

On 04/17/2012 Rodney Jones filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dr Uzoma Nriagu. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4602

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jones, Rodney

Defendant

Dr. Uzoma Nriagu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Doyle, Frank A

7676 Woodway Suite 350

Houston, TX 77063

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketDismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketEvent: Motion Docket; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Oct 25 09:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • DocketEvent: Motion Docket; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Sep 25 09:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketEvent: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Wed Oct 10 14:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketEvent: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Wed Aug 08 14:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Jun 19 09:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Jones, Rodney; Parties Against: Dr. Uzoma Nriagu

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOYLE, FRANK A.