This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/07/2022 at 04:01:20 (UTC).

Robert J Connor, Joan B Connor vs. Liberty Mutual Group, INC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Robert J Connor, Joan B Connor filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Group, INC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5937

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Connor, Robert J

Connor, Joan B

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Group, INC

Not Classified By Court

Corporation Service Company DBA CSC-Lawyers INCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jones, William Everett, Jr

P.O. Box 924857

Houston, TX 77292

Defendant Attorney

Coburn, Brittany

P.O. Box 7217

London, KY 40742

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketPending Jury Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $22.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Liberty Mutual Group, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketJury Fee Civil - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $69.00; Payment Type: American Express; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Connor, Robert J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, William Everett, Jr