Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:08:59 (UTC).

Rl Equity Llc vs. Taylor Watson

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Rl Equity Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Taylor Watson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2869

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Llc, Rl Equity

110 Avenue B Suite 100 N/A

Stafford, TX 77477

Defendant

Watson, Taylor

Baytown, TX 77520

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Llc, Rl Equity

110 Avenue B Suite 100

Stafford, TX 77477

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Llc, Rl Equity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Llc, Rl Equity; Parties Against: Watson, Taylor; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Llc, Rl Equity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less