This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/02/2018 at 01:58:14 (UTC).

Richard Mackinnon vs. Consuelo R Hernandez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2013 Richard Mackinnon filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Consuelo R Hernandez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9502

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mackinnon, Richard

Defendant

Hernandez, Consuelo R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketPending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2013
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2013
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Mackinnon, Richard; Parties Against: Hernandez, Consuelo R; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $325.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less