This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/16/2017 at 03:25:25 (UTC).

Richard L Pfirman vs. Abrassaux Washington

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 Richard L Pfirman filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Abrassaux Washington. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4477

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pfirman, Richard L

Houston, TX 77090

Defendant

Washington, Abrassaux

Houston, TX 77087

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • Order-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $75.00; Payment Type: Cashier's Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Pfirman, Richard L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Cashier's Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Pfirman, Richard L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Mon Jun 12 08:30:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Jun 06 13:30:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less