This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/22/2018 at 03:09:48 (UTC).

Reed Parque Townhomes vs. Brittany Foy

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 Reed Parque Townhomes filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Brittany Foy. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9697

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reed Parque Townhomes

2725 Reed Road

Houston, TX 77051

Defendant

Foy, Brittany

Houston, TX 77051

Not Classified By Court

Chacon, Monica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Reed Parque Townhomes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Nov 09 09:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Reed Parque Townhomes; Parties Against: Foy, Brittany; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less