Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/01/2019 at 13:48:45 (UTC).

Ramdass Enterprise Llc vs. Tanya Ordonez-McGuire, Joe Ordonez

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 Ramdass Enterprise Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tanya Ordonez-McGuire, Joe Ordonez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9793

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramdass Enterprise Llc

11907 Canyon Mills Drive

Houston, TX 77095

Defendants

Ordonez-McGuire, Tanya

Houston, TX 77028

Ordonez, Joe

Houston, TX 77028

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Transcript Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Eviction-Statement of Inability to Pay at Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Eviction-Notice Tenant Filing Statement of Inability Pay App

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Eviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $191.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Ramdass Enterprise Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Ramdass Enterprise Llc; Parties Against: Ordonez-McGuire, Tanya and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $975.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less