This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/07/2020 at 03:29:32 (UTC).

Raliat Doherty vs. Norvind Rolando Hernandez

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Raliat Doherty filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Norvind Rolando Hernandez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6229

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doherty, Raliat

Houston, TX 77080

Defendant

Hernandez, Norvind Rolando

Cypress, TX 77433-3227

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingDescription: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingHearing: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $124.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Doherty, Raliat

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less