This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/16/2023 at 05:06:21 (UTC).

Quail Creek Apartments vs. Abraham Villanueva Rojas

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Quail Creek Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Abraham Villanueva Rojas. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9318

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quail Creek Apartments

7835 Grow Lane

Houston, TX 77040

Defendant

Rojas, Abraham Villanueva

Houston, TX 77040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Quail Creek Apartments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quail Creek Apartments I-II is a litigant