This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:50:42 (UTC).

Qs1-5K Llc vs. Fidel Salinas

Case Summary

On 01/12/2016 Qs1-5K Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Fidel Salinas. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3214

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QS1-5K LLC

Defendant

SALINAS, FIDEL

Houston, TX 77087

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLS, WILLIAM M

2927 Broadway

Houston, TX 77017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Eviction-Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Eviction-Notice Tenant Filing Statement of Inability Pay App

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Eviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2016
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Qs1-5K Llc; Parties Against: Salinas, Fidel; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $8415.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walls, William M.