This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/18/2017 at 06:56:05 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc Assignee of Mbna/Fia Card Services,N.A. vs. Bertha A Silva

Case Summary

On 07/21/2014 Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc Assignee of Mbna/Fia Card Services,N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bertha A Silva. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0690

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc Assignee of Mbna/Fia Card Services,N.A.

Defendant

Silva, Bertha A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lloyd, Jamila Boozer

15851 North Dallas Pkwy Suite 245

Addison, TX 75001

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketDismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • DocketOrder-Granting Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Wed May 27 09:30:00 CDT 2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Continued; Completion Date: Tue Jan 20 09:30:00 CST 2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc Assignee of Mbna/Fia Card Services,N.A.; Parties Against: Silva, Bertha A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamila Boozer Lloyd