Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 13:18:42 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Thelma Dennis

Case Summary

On 04/07/2017 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thelma Dennis. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4665

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Dennis, Thelma

Spring, TX 77389

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilson, Christina S

15660 N Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant Attorneys

Heston, James B

607 Park Grove Dr Suite B

Katy, TX 77450

Heston, James

P O Box 6049

Katy, TX 77491

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Order-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Request for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Proposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Debt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: TD Bank USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: TD Bank USA, N.A.; Parties Against: Dennis, Thelma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Heston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HESTON, JAMES B