This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/29/2023 at 14:08:23 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Cindy Contreras

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cindy Contreras. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6022

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendant

Contreras, Cindy

Humble, TX 77346-4206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olsen-Zhang, Jessica

15660 N Dallas Pkwy, Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less