This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/26/2018 at 05:19:49 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Money Bank F.S.B. (Home Design Generic) vs. Jimmy Lopez

Case Summary

On 08/27/2013 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Money Bank F S B Home Design Generic filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jimmy Lopez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9281

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Money Bank F.S.B. (Home Design Generic)

Defendant

LOPEZ, JIMMY

Receiver

Hwang, Stephan D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMER, JEFFREY SCOTT

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Other Attorneys

Jones, Stephen Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2013
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Money Bank F.S.B. (Home Design Generic); Parties Against: Lopez, Jimmy; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $1810.06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Thomas Jones