This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/10/2018 at 13:20:26 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank (Sam 's Club) vs. Jorge Jimenez

Case Summary

On 12/12/2014 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank Sam 's Club filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jorge Jimenez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1381

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank (Sam's Club)

Defendant

JIMENEZ, JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARZA, MICHAEL J

15660 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketNotice-Default Judgment 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank (Sam's Club); Parties Against: Jimenez, Jorge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Garza