Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/28/2017 at 14:57:03 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank (Sam 's Club) vs. John Saucedo

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank Sam 's Club filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against John Saucedo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4793

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK (SAMS CLUB)

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank (Sam's Club)

Defendant

SAUCEDO, JOHN

Cypress, TX 77429

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, CHRISTINA S

15660 N Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Debt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Event: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Tue Oct 18 15:00:00 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank (Sam's Club); Parties Against: Saucedo, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Disposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less