Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/28/2017 at 15:05:09 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank Ge Capital Retail Bank Discount Tire vs. Eddie Trail

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank Ge Capital Retail Bank Discount Tire filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eddie Trail. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7914

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK GE CAPITAL

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank Ge Capital Retail Bank Discount Tire

Defendant

TRAIL, EDDIE

Katy, TX 77449

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LLOYD, JAMILA BOOZER

120 Corporate Boulevard

Norfolk, VA 23502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • Dismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Notice-Trial Setting 503.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Request for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Order-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Mon Jun 27 08:30:00 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion Date: Mon Apr 04 08:30:00 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Ge Capital Retail Bank Ge Capital Retail Bank Discount Tire; Parties Against: Trail, Eddie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Disposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less