Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/19/2018 at 15:43:38 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Capital One Bank USA Na Assignee of Hsbc Bank Nevada Na Orchard Bank vs. Tisha R Dupont-Armstrong

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Capital One Bank USA Na Assignee of Hsbc Bank Nevada Na Orchard Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tisha R Dupont-Armstrong. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7118

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA ASSIGNEE O

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Capital One Bank USA Na Assignee of Hsbc Bank Nevada Na Orchard Bank

Defendant

DUPONT-ARMSTRONG, TISHA R

Pasadena, TX 77503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILEY, KELVINA W

15660 North Dallas Pkwy Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Wiley, Kelvina E

15660 N Dallas Parkway Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2016
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee of Capital One Bank USA Na Assignee of Hsbc Bank Nevada Na Orchard Bank; Parties Against: Dupont-Armstrong, Tisha R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less