This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 06:34:14 (UTC).

Polycap O Philip vs. Gloria Narajno

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 Polycap O Philip filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gloria Narajno. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4679

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philip, Polycap O

Houston, TX 77272

Defendants

Valdamir, Gloria

Houston, TX 77036

Narajno, Gloria

Houston, TX 77036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Order-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Motion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Order-Granting Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Order-Granting Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Exhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Response Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Small Claims-Amended Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $75.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Philip, Polycap O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Philip, Polycap O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Tue Feb 06 09:00:00 CST 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Jan 02 09:00:00 CST 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Nov 03 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Disposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less