This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 04:33:16 (UTC).

Patrick Oconnor & Associates Lp vs. G Nayak II LLC, Grip Enterprises LLC, Bright Builders Llc, Gurdev L.L.C

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 Patrick Oconnor Associates Lp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against G Nayak II LLC, Grip Enterprises LLC, Bright Builders Llc, Gurdev L L C. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0494

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Oconnor & Associates Lp

2200 North Loop West Suite 200

Houston, TX 77018

Defendants

Bright Builders Llc

12810 Willow Centre Suite D

Houston, TX 77066

Gurudev LLC

Grip Enterprises LLC

G Nayak II LLC

12810 Willow Centre Suite D

Houston, TX 77066

Gurdev L.L.C

Not Classified By Court

Kaur, Ranjit

Naik, Tejas

Jolly, Ravinder

Narang, Harcharan Singh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Small Claims-Amended Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Pending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Patrick Oconnor & Associates Lp

    Read MoreRead Less