This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/25/2022 at 04:14:18 (UTC).

Patrick O 'Connor & Associates LP vs. Stallion Texas Real Estate Fund LLC, Texas Development & Construction Services LLC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Patrick O 'Connor Associates LP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Stallion Texas Real Estate Fund LLC, Texas Development Construction Services LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7096

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick O'Connor & Associates LP

Defendants

Stallion Texas Real Estate Fund LLC

Texas Development & Construction Services LLC

Not Classified By Court

Corporation Service D/B/A CSC-Lawyers Inc

Purvis, Tiffanie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahrous, Nadeen

P O Box 554

Barker, TX 77413

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Patrick O'Connor & Associates LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Texas Development Company as Leasing Agent for 529 #60 Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Patarick O'Connor & Associaes LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant