This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/19/2018 at 15:06:48 (UTC).

Patrick O 'Connor & Associates Lp vs. Latasha Campbell

Case Summary

On 08/10/2015 Patrick O 'Connor Associates Lp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Latasha Campbell. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5579

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICK OCONNOR & ASSOCIATES LP

2200 North Loop West Suite 200

Houston, TX 77018

Patrick O'Connor & Associates Lp

2200 North Loop West Suite 200

Houston, TX 77018-1754

Defendant

CAMPBELL, LATASHA

Houston, TX 77044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWTON, AUDRIE L

2200 North Loop West Suite 200

Houston, TX 77018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Order-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Campbell, Latasha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue May 31 13:24:16 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Patrick O'Connor & Associates Lp; Parties Against: Campbell, Latasha; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $326.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Patarick O'Connor & Associaes LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawton, Audrie L