This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/12/2021 at 03:27:38 (UTC).

Park 45 vs. Tarosa Brinkley

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Park 45 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tarosa Brinkley. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2353

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park 45

20330 Whitewood Dr

Spring, TX 77373

Defendant

Brinkley, Tarosa

Spring, TX 77373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Mon Apr 19 13:00:00 CDT 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Park 45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Park 45 is a litigant